Ascah, Kathryn Joan (CPSO#: 50095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
H-1220
University Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7268
Fax: (613) 696-7248
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terrence Ruddy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ruddy ( CPSO# 51536 )
Dr. K. Ascah ( CPSO# 50095 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4085


Corporation Name: Kathryn Ascah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ruddy ( CPSO# 51536 )
Dr. K. Ascah ( CPSO# 50095 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite H-1220B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4688

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN JOAN ASCAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASCAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986