Asch, Murray Ross (CPSO#: 52679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3497
Fax: (905) 721-4770
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727


Corporation Name: Asch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6831

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY ROSS ASCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1984