Asfour, Nabil Ahmad (CPSO#: 92679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2301 Tecumseh Road East #140
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (226) 221-9295
Fax: (226) 221-9049
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5-130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Canada
Phone: 5192504449
Fax: 5192507807
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabil Asfour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Asfour ( CPSO# 92679 )

Business Address:
140 - 2301 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 915-4456

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NABIL AHMAD ASFOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASFOUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 May 2010 to 28 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015