Ash, Leslie Charles (CPSO#: 19121)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation 265 Dundas Street East Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015