Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ash, Robert Blair (CPSO#: 69367)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2008