Ashamalla, Alison Kathleen (CPSO#: 82967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Palmer, Alison Kathleen (used until: 24 Jun 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Riverdale Community
Health Centre
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone: (416) 461-2493
Fax: (416) 461-8245
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashamalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ashamalla ( CPSO# 82967 )
Dr. S. Ashamalla ( CPSO# 82890 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2015 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4027

Business Address:
South Riverdale Community Health Centre
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone Number: (416) 461-2493

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON KATHLEEN ASHAMALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHAMALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007