Ashamalla, Nawal Basaly (CPSO#: 52104)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1988