Ashater, Elsharif Mohamed Milad (CPSO#: 80663)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Tahady University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Apr 2004 to 23 Aug 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 24 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2007 to 27 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2008 to 27 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2015