Ashby, John Gary (CPSO#: 19571)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2015


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Poly Clinic, Unit 204, 5460 Yonge Street, Toronto, ON M2N 6K7
Date Received: 12 Jun 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2015