Ashfield, Jane Gwyneth Lewis (CPSO#: 71494)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Lewis, Jane Gwyneth (used until: 13 Oct 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2003