Ashley, Mary Jane (CPSO#: 19181)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1994