Ashraf, Hossain Saied (CPSO#: 111173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  13 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of North Texas at Fort Worth (TCOM), 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgina Health Centre
716 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 4C9
Phone: (905) 535-6000
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgina Health Centre
45 Grist Mill Road
Suite 3
Holland Landing ON  L9N 1M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 535-2345
Fax: (905) 235-7077
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Hossain  Saied Ashraf may practise family medicine with the Georgina
                  Health Centre in  Keswick,  Ontario  and  Grist Mill Family Physicians in
                  Holland  Landing,   Ontario  while  under supervision  coordinated  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on May 13, 2018.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Ashraf's  knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Ashraf's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to  the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Ashraf's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on November 14, 2016, and will expire  on  or
                  before May 13, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.