Ashrafi, Ahmad Shah (CPSO#: 71218)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, German, Hindi, Pushto

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 8 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2009