Ashton, Christopher William (CPSO#: 62107)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: May 1, 2003
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 1, 2003, Dr. Christopher William Ashton undertook to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario the following,
-- to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (note: his College
registration had already expired on August 2, 2002, for non-payment of membership fee), and
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in
any jurisdiction.