Ashton, Rosalind (CPSO#: 97786)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2017