Askalan, Rand A (CPSO#: 76382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAND A ASKALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASKALAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006