Aslani Amoli, Nava (CPSO#: 95933)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 25 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Colorectal Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017