Asmis, Timothy Richard (CPSO#: 76231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-737-7700
Fax: 613-247-3511
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613-737-7700
Fax: 613-247-3511
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asmis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Asmis ( CPSO# 76231 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY RICHARD ASMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASMIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005