Asper, Maria (CPSO#: 72556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Triassi, Maria (used until: 28 May 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 856-8714
Fax: (905) 856-4036
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 201
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Canada
Phone: (416) 531-3331
Fax: (416) 531-1639
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Department of Clinical
Immunology and Allergy
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-8627
Fax: (416) 813-8638
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA ASPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002