Aspinall, Nigel David (CPSO#: 66348)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1997