Asrar, Farhan Muhammad (CPSO#: 89957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
160 Main St. S, Unit 6
Brampton ON  L6W 2E1
Phone: 905 874 8787
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

74 Queen Street West
Brampton ON  L6X 1A3
Canada
Phone: 905 455 6666
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

100 Main Street West, 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 546-9885
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2760 Derry Rd West, Unit 3
Mississauga ON  L5N 3N5
Canada
Phone: 289-997-3220
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

160 Main Street S. Unit 6
Brampton ON  L6W 2E1
Canada
Phone: 905 874 8787
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farhan M. Asrar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Asrar ( CPSO# 89957 )

Business Address:
344 Kerr Street
Oakville ON  L6K 3B8
Phone Number: (905) 845-8000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARHAN MUHAMMAD ASRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASRAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 24 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2014