Asrat, Getnet Abebe (CPSO#: 87063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Valley Health Service
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Fax: (613) 440-3238
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree Medical Group
1582 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z5
Canada
Phone: (613) 482-0118
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

220 Preston street
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Canada
Phone: (613) 288-2437
Fax: (613) 680-6420
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Asrat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Asrat ( CPSO# 87063 )

Business Address:
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone Number: (613) 258-8710

Business Address:
225 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7R1
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GETNET ABEBE ASRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASRAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009