Assaad, Ihab Guirguis Rizk (CPSO#: 76488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3946
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihab Assaad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Assaad ( CPSO# 76488 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IHAB GUIRGUIS RIZK ASSAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 09 Oct 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jul 2008