Assad, Christopher James (CPSO#: 65035)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
4300 Upper Middle Road
Burlington ON  L7M 4P6
Phone: (905) 315-9994
Fax: (905) 315-9998
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Assad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Assad ( CPSO# 65035 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
4300 Upper Middle Road
Burlington ON  L7M 4P6
Phone Number: (905) 315-9994

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 28 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES ASSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993