Assad, Paul Joseph Pierre (CPSO#: 70853)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 2010