Assad, Samir Roshdy Girgis (CPSO#: 82212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vibrant Medical Square
Building E
Suite 204
2640 Rutherford Road
Concord ON  L4K 0H3
Phone: (905) 303-0307
Fax: (905) 303-0207
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samir R.G. Assad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Assad ( CPSO# 82212 )

Business Address:
Vibrant Medical Square
Building E
Suite 204
2640 Rutherford Road
Concord ON  L4K 0H3
Phone Number: (905) 303-0307

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Aug 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Aug 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 15, 2012, the following term, condition and limitation is
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Samir Roshdy Girgis
            Assad, in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Assad has provided to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective immediately, Dr. Assad shall not practice massage therapy.
                  Furthermore, effective immediately, Dr. Assad shall not engage in any
                  professional encounters with female patients of any age, in any
                  jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of
                  a female practice monitor, and unless the other requirements provided in
                  his Undertaking with the College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr.
                  Assad may not be alone with any female patient, during any professional
                  encounter.