Assaff, David Anthony Arthur (CPSO#: 60159)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 2000