Assiri, Amer Mohammed Amer Alyanallah (CPSO#: 104903)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2014 to 04 Nov 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 05 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2015