Assuras, John William (CPSO#: 55514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Fax: (519) 685-8736
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM ASSURAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSURAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1990