Astani, Roxana (CPSO#: 99155)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 29 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2013 to 08 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 05 May 2016 to 02 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2016