Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Astaphan, George Mario (CPSO#: 25508)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Jun 1991
Summary:

 In June 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Astaphan guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that 
 are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); in that he charged a fee 
 for services not performed, contrary to s. 27(15); in that he falsified a record in respect of the 
 examination or treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 27(16); in that he knowingly submitted a 
 false or misleading account or false or misleading charges for services rendered to a patient, 
 contrary to s. 27(17); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, 
 contrary to s. 27(21); in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or 
 dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug, 
 contrary to s. 27(26); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Astaphan's licence to practice be suspended for a period of eighteen months, and 
 that he be fined the sum of $5000.00.  The Committee further stipulated that Dr. Astaphan consent 
 to and cooperate in an inspection of his practice of the kind provided for under s. 64 of the 
 Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, within six months and again within eighteen months of 
 his recommencing his practice in Ontario.  Dr. Astaphan was also obliged to undertake to comply 
 with directives of the College concerning the prescription and use of anabolic steroids, as set 
 out in the College Notice of November 1988.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 22 May 1992
Hearing Date(s): 03 Jun 1991