Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Astaphan, Karl Lauri Damian (CPSO#: 62918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
153 Main St.
West Lorne ON  N0L 2P0
Phone: (519) 768-1715
Fax: (519) 768-2548
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 Metcalf St.
Woodstock ON  N4S 3E6
Canada
Phone: 519-539-1111
Fax: 519-539-9111
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

240 Wharncliffe Rd
London ON  N6H 4P2
Canada
Phone: (519) 435-0111
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

St Kitts and Nevis
USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARL LAURI DAMIAN ASTAPHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASTAPHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 05 Jan 1993
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1990