Astrope, Valerie Joan (CPSO#: 85462)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2008