Aswald, Jorg Michael (CPSO#: 78866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 210
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 641-2102
Fax: (519) 641-2103
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jorg Aswald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aswald ( CPSO# 78866 )

Business Address:
Unit 210
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 641-2102

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORG MICHAEL ASWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASWALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2003 to 05 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 06 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 08 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Aug 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007