Atallah, Soha Othman (CPSO#: 101243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70240
Fax: (613) 737-9638
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOHA OTHMAN ATALLAH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ATALLAH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ATALLAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ATALLAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ATALLAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ATALLAH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ATALLAH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018