Atapattu, Vidura Indika (CPSO#: 94543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Sinhala

Education:Doneck Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stroud Medical Centre
Box 7041
7869 Yonge Street
Innisfil ON  L9S 1K8
Phone: (705) 436-2251
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vidura Atapattu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Atapattu ( CPSO# 94543 )

Business Address:
Stroud Medical Centre
7869 Yonge Street
Box 7041
Suite 1
Innisfil ON  L9S 1K8
Phone Number: (705) 436-2251

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIDURA INDIKA ATAPATTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATAPATTU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2013