Atcha, Farida (CPSO#: 76634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Urdu

Education:Eugenio Maria De Hostos University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Atcha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Atcha ( CPSO# 76634 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARIDA ATCHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATCHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 04 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003