Athaide, Gregory Owen (CPSO#: 80895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 16
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 231-1555
Fax: 8665859225
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Depart of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Athaide Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Athaide ( CPSO# 80895 )
Dr. S. Athaide ( CPSO# 31824 )

Business Address:
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 16
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 231-1555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY OWEN ATHAIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATHAIDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009