Athaide, Sylvia Bella (CPSO#: 31824)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sylvia Athaide Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017


Corporation Name: Gregory Athaide Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Athaide ( CPSO# 80895 )
Dr. S. Athaide ( CPSO# 31824 )

Business Address:
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 16
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 231-1555

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Tel: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Email: medicalrecords@docudavit.com
Date Received: 08 Feb 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2017