Athwal, Iqbal Kaur (CPSO#: 70377)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: Athwal-Bloom, Iqbal Kaur (used until: 19 Feb 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2008