Atiyah, Abdulrazzak Oglah (CPSO#: 96833)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 716 King Street New Waterford, NS B1H 3Z5
Date Received: 23 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014