Atkins, Harold Lawrence (CPSO#: 54640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70341
Fax: (613) 737-8768
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atkins & Macmillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Macmillan ( CPSO# 54620 )
Dr. H. Atkins ( CPSO# 54640 )

Business Address:
Canadian Medical Protective Association
P.O. Box 8225 Station T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone Number: (613) 725-2000

Business Address:
University Health Network
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2

Business Address:
Canadian Medical Protective Association
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone Number: (613) 725-2000

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAROLD LAWRENCE ATKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATKINS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992