Atkins, James Anthony (CPSO#: 87706)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Please contact the hospital where treatment was received for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 04 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jul 2003 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016