Atkinson, Carolyn Ruth (CPSO#: 72097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective
Association
PO Box 8225 Station T
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN RUTH ATKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATKINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Mar 1998 to 31 Mar 1998
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Mar 2002 to 03 Mar 2003
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2012