Atkinson, Elaine Louise (CPSO#: 63567)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Troughton, Elaine Louise (used until: 24 Jun 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: R.P.O. Hartzel Rd P.O. Box 35016 Hartzel, St. Catharines, ON L2P 0C5
Date Received: 16 May 2017


Address: P O Box 35065 R P O Harzel Road St Catharines ON L2P 0C5
Date Received: 17 Apr 2015

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017