Atkinson, Henry Dushan Edward (CPSO#: 88084)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2008 to 26 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008