Atkinson, Mary Lynne (CPSO#: 28053)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Jackson-Hughes, Mary Lynne (used until: 24 Aug 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay District Health Unit 999 Balmoral Street Thunder Bay ON P7B 6E7
Date Received: 16 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016