Atlas, Seymour (CPSO#: 76612)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cape Town, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 26 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2002