Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Atri, Mostafa (CPSO#: 50818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
N C S B 1C 569 T G H
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3253
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Atri ( CPSO# 50818 )

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOSTAFA ATRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATRI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1983