Atsariyasing, Wanlop (CPSO#: 102684)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mahidol University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2014 to 06 May 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015